Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson and Malone
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is an educator; and applying penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment for up to 10 years or a fine not to exceed $5,000 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1258 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM