Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Afzali, McConkey, McKay, Vogt, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified mandatory minimum penalty for a third or subsequent offense of driving under the influence of alcohol or under the influence of alcohol per se; authorizing, with a specified exception, the seizure and forfeiture of a motor vehicle that a person drives or attempts to drive while under the influence of alcohol when the person is convicted of a third or subsequent violation of driving or attempting to drive while under the influence of alcohol or under the influence of alcohol per se within 10 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-902, 27-101, 28-101 through 28-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM