Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Carter, Frank, Frush, Gaines, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Howard, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Morhaim, Rosenberg, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of health care malpractice claims.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0834
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {212010/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {103229/1 Rejected
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-10)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {212010/2 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {103229/1 Rejected 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-10) 55
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM