Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a lender from maintaining an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property in the State for 6 months; establishing a specified penalty for a person who files an affidavit relating to a foreclosure notice when the person knows or has reason to know that the contents of the notice are inaccurate; requiring a court to send a specified checklist to the mortgagor or grantor of owner-occupied residential property when a specified foreclosure is filed; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0755
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM