Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Grammer, Malone, McComas, and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling that is located in a revitalization district and is owned by a homeowner who, on or after June 1, 2017, made specified substantial improvements to the dwelling that cause the dwelling to be reassessed at a higher value; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM