Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Anderson, Barnes, Barve, Braveboy, Carr, Gaines, Glenn, Harper, Haynes, Healey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Kaiser, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, B. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, Swain, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Walker, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified employer that employs specified qualified employees for specified time periods a credit against the State income tax in specified amounts; authorizing an individual to apply to the Department of Business and Economic Development to be certified as a qualified employee; authorizing a business entity to apply to the Department to be certified as a qualified employer; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
2/07/2014 Text - First - Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page