Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegate Wood
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to adopt regulations to establish a methodology for applying life cycle cost analysis to the evaluation of specified pavement projects; requiring that the methodology address specified matters; requiring the Department to utilize the results of the life cycle cost analysis for specified projects; defining a term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {665969/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 61A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM