Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Dwyer, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McDermott, McDonough, Otto, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allocating specified motor fuel tax revenue to a specified account that is shared with local governments; increasing the portion of highway user revenue that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenue among Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0765
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1103 )
(   8-402, 8-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM