Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Haynes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Human Resources to establish the Family Literacy Pilot Program in the Department of Human Resources; limiting the Program to 500 recipients in specified locations; requiring the Secretary to cooperate with local directors of social services and to consult with the Maryland State Department of Education and specified adult literacy providers regarding the establishment of the Program; establishing the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-318.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM