Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Cullison, Gutierrez, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, S. Robinson, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that specified leave be included in reasonable accommodations for specified disabilities caused or contributed to by pregnancy or childbirth under specified circumstances; and requiring specified employers to have specified employment policies.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing cancelled (Economic Matters)
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-601, 20-606, 20-609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM