Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB1336 - 2020RS
   CH0031 - 2021RS
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Acevero, Anderson, D. Barnes, Carr, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Harrison, Haynes, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Smith, Turner, Washington, Wilkins, and Conaway
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 31 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records if the person is convicted of fourth degree burglary; prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search from in any way referring to the existence of certain records relating to certain charges under certain circumstances; establishing the Partial Expungement Workgroup to study, develop a plan, and make legislative recommendations for enabling the expungement of criminal charges that are not currently eligible for expungement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0589
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0220 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020, June 1, 2020, January 1, 2021
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582716/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-34)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (99-37)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 31 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-34) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {188073/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (99-37)
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Overridden (31-15)
House 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 31 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
(   10-105.1, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page