Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local Hiring
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Gaines, and Gutierrez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning, in consultation with the Department of Transportation and Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, to establish a specified program to maximize opportunities for work-based learning and local hiring in connection with specified State construction projects; requiring the program to include a specified local hiring plan and method of reporting specified information; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM