Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsored by
Delegates Minnick and Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified payment alternatives that under specified circumstances allow a person that provides vehicle towing, recovery, or storage services to avoid having to accept payment by at least two major, nationally recognized credit cards; requiring a police department or other person that stores an abandoned vehicle to accept payment for outstanding towing, preservation, and storage charges by cash or at least two major, nationally recognized credit cards; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-10A-05, 25-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM