Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Carter, Conaway, and Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the type and the number of positions the Baltimore City Sheriff may appoint; increasing from $200 to $400 an annual expense allowance for a deputy sheriff; altering specified surcharges on filing fees in the District Court in Baltimore City; requiring the revenue generated from the surcharge to be remitted quarterly to the Baltimore City Director of Finance and used to fund the enhancement of sheriff benefits and the increase in sheriff personnel to enhance the service of domestic violence orders; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {820817/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948272/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Delegates Healey, Glenn, and Otto
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senators Gladden, Muse, and Getty
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {820817/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {948272/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Delegates Healey, Glenn, and Otto 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senators Gladden, Muse, and Getty 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-309, 7-301, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM