Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Adams, Afzali, Beitzel, Buckel, Chang, Cluster, Corderman, Folden, Ghrist, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local jurisdiction to authorize a residential major subdivision served by on-site sewage disposal systems, community sewerage systems, or shared systems in Tier III and Tier IV areas under certain circumstances; exempting certain residential major subdivisions from certain provisions of law; and specifying that the Act does not create new development rights.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1355 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM