Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Simonaire, Buckel, Glass, and Metzgar
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish a Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to be used only for nonpoint source pollution control projects except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the transfer of funds in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to the General Fund or a special fund of the State except under specified circumstances; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0045
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0302 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM