Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a clean energy attribute credit standard for certain purposes; repealing certain provisions relating to the renewable energy portfolio standard; stating certain findings of the General Assembly; stating certain policies of the State regarding certain energy sources and markets; requiring the Public Service Commission to appoint an independent administrator for certain purposes with certain qualifications and certain duties; providing for the term and reappointment of the independent administrator; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0890
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   7-701, 7-702 through 7-705, 7-702 through 7-706, 7-706, 7-707, 7-708 through 7-711, 7-713 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page