Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the certificate of need requirements for change of scope or capital expenditures the conversion of a licensed general hospital to a freestanding medical facility, in accordance with specified requirements; increasing from 45 to 90 the number of days before the proposed closing of a health care facility for the filing of the notice of the proposed closing; establishing the workgroup on rural health care delivery to study health care needs in five specified counties; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396582/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Lisanti) {793828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447278/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {247677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {396582/2 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Lisanti) {793828/1 Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {447278/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {247677/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-120, 19-201, 19-211, 19-3A-01, 19-3A-03, 19-3A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM