Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Barve, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Morhaim, Robinson, and Holmes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of the construction practice term "Coast Smart" to include highway facilities; requiring the Coast Smart Council in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Transportation, to establish Coast Smart siting and design criteria to address sea level rise inundation and coastal flood impacts on State and local projects; requiring a local jurisdiction that experiences nuisance flooding to develop a plan to address the flooding by July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1006
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744836/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-39)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, Mitigation, and Disclosure
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {930813/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {744836/1 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Mathias) Adopted 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {744836/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 59
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (99-39) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Text - Chapter - Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001, 3-1002 through 3-1004, 3-1009, 3-1012, 3-1015, 3-1018 )
(   3-101, 8-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM