Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Anderton, Beitzel, Chang, Cullison, Folden, Hornberger, Krebs, McComas, McCray, McKay, Morgan, Shoemaker, Simonaire, and Stein
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing county boards of education to authorize a student to satisfy a State or county middle or high school foreign language requirement by completing a course in computer programming language; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Education - Foreign Language Requirement - Computer Programming Language Courses
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Reassigned to Ways and Means 24
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM