Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police, in consultation with the Maryland Chiefs of Police Association and the Maryland Sheriffs' Association, to conduct a study of potential methods of improving the enforcement of laws that prohibit the use of wireless communication and text-messaging devices while operating a motor vehicle; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - Study
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM