Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Buckel, Gutierrez, Rose, M. Washington, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the motor vehicle excise tax and certificate of title fee may not be imposed on the issuance of a certificate of title for specified vehicles transferred without consideration if the vehicle is transferred in a specified manner to or from specified trusts; altering the definition of "consideration"; defining "vehicle"; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0449
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226889/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {226889/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14.5-1001, 14.5-103 )
(   13-802, 13-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM