Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, B. Wilson, Cluster, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the elements of a specified drug-related driving offense and a specified drug-related operation of a vessel offense; eliminating a specified defense to specified drug-related offenses; increasing specified criminal penalties for specified drug-related offenses; altering specified administrative penalties for specified drug-related driving offenses; requiring a person who is convicted of specified drug-related driving offenses to undergo a mental health assessment and participate in specified programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   10-302, 10-303, 10-305, 10-306, 10-308 )
(   2-505, 2-507, 3-211, 3-212 )
(   11-109.1, 16-205, 16-205.1, 16-402, 18-105, 21-902, 26-202, 26-404, 26-405, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page