Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Barnes and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing Class CS (chain store) beer and wine licenses for club stores, supermarkets, drug stores, and convenience stores; authorizing a holder of a retail alcoholic beverages license to qualify for a direct wine shipper's permit; altering the number of Class A alcoholic beverages licenses that may be issued to an individual; authorizing a local licensing board to adopt regulations to allow a person to sell alcoholic beverages on Sunday; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 11-403, 12-202.1, 12-209, 21-107, 4-101, 5-701 through 5-705, 7.5-103, 7.5-105, 8-211, 8-216, 9-102, 9-107, 9-108, 9-202, 9-204.1, 9-209, 9-211, 9-213, 9-217, 9-222, 9-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM