Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $1,100,000,000 to $1,130,000,000 the cap on the maximum amount of bonds the Maryland Stadium Authority is authorized to issue to finance improvements to Baltimore City public school facilities; requiring a supplemental memorandum of understanding to be entered into before the issuance of additional bonds to finance improvements to a Baltimore City public school facility; requiring certain State lottery revenues to be deposited into the Baltimore City Public School Construction Financing Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Public School Construction - Bonds and Supplemental Memorandum of Understanding
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-628, 10-646, 10-646.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM