Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Periodic Full Evaluations
Sponsored by
Delegate Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a specified full evaluation of specified governmental activities or units in specified years and every 30 years thereafter; requiring the Department to complete specified full evaluations by December 1 in an evaluation year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Government - Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Periodic Full Evaluations
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM