Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, McIntosh, Reznik, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from committing a child for inpatient care and treatment in a psychiatric facility under certain circumstances; prohibiting a local department from placing a child in, delivering a child to, or failing to remove a child from a hospital, an emergency or inpatient facility under certain circumstances; authorizing a hospital, an emergency facility, or an inpatient facility to petition a court to compel a local department to remove a child from the hospital, emergency or inpatient facility; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744268/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Reassigned to Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {744268/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Placement in Medical Facilities
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-533.1 )
(   10-620, 10-624 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page