Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians
Sponsored by
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 15, 2013.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0916
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333690/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {333690/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM