Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to adopt in regulation a pharmaceutical fee schedule; providing for the setting of reimbursement rates for specified drugs; requiring that a pharmaceutical bill submitted to an employer or its insurer for reimbursement of a repackaged or compounded drug contain specified information; and requiring an employer or its insurer to reimburse a claimant for a specified drug under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-663, 9-665 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM