Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates James and Glass
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Harford County to impose a hotel rental tax of 6% within a specified area; requiring a hotel located in Harford County to collect the tax and to file a tax return and pay taxes collected on or before a specified date each month; exempting specified hotels from the hotel rental tax; authorizing the governing body of Harford County to provide an exemption from the hotel rental tax for transient charges paid by specified organizations to provide temporary shelter for specified individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {835967/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {835967/2 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson) 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM