Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Hayes, Anderson, B. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Davis, Ebersole, Frick, Gilchrist, Hammen, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, and Jalisi
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Seed Community Development Anchor Institution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide grants and loans to anchor institutions for community development projects in blighted areas of the State; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 to the Fund for fiscal years 2018 through 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {980617/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-50)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899137/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-50)
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {980617/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (87-50) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {899137/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {899137/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (85-50) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM