Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a checkoff on the individual income tax return through which a United States citizen or legal permanent resident may make a contribution to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to take specified actions to administer the checkoff; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM