Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Hornberger, Reilly, Simonaire, Tarlau, A. Washington, and Afzali
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a tax collector to issue a refund of excess property tax to a taxpayer within 30 days after the State Department of Assessments and Taxation provides to the tax collector specified notice that a specified appeal authority has issued a decision reducing the taxpayer's assessment; and specifying the contents of the notice.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175066/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {175066/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {219537/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-516 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM