Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting certain public school construction projects that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding from certain requirements; requiring public school construction projects in Prince George's County that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding to comply with certain requirements and a certain memorandum of understanding; establishing the Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund to provide supplemental State funds to finance alternative financing methods; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1011
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (135-0) 36
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Appropriations 36
Text - First - Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-126, 4-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM