Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
Sponsored by
Chair, Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Howard County Department of Correction to establish community service and pretrial services programs; authorizing the Director of the Howard County Department of Correction to adopt regulations relating to the operation of certain programs; authorizing a certain judge or court to allow a certain individual to participate in a certain program under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain inmate to leave the Howard County Detention Center under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Text - Third - Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM