Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to sell real property solely to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer services; prohibiting Baltimore City from acquiring real property by means of execution of a judgment under certain circumstances; providing that the Act applies prospectively to liens attached to real property on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905662/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {905662/1 Adopted 38
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM