Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $4,000 the maximum amount of a State matching stipend awarded to certificated public school employees who teach in specified public schools; requiring specified teachers in Anne Arundel County to receive a stipend of $1,500 under specified circumstances; establishing the Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Pilot Program; authorizing each county board of education to choose to participate in the Pilot Program; requiring a county board to select specified teachers to participate in the Pilot Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {255668/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate McMillan) Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {653628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-45)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {255668/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate McMillan) Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {653628/1 Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (91-45) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-117.1, 6-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM