Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations
Sponsored by
Delegates Bobo, Bates, DeBoy, Guzzone, Malone, W. Miller, Pendergrass, and F. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, under specified circumstances, the chief election official of the election authority shall prepare the format and a specified summary of an act or part of an act proposed to be petitioned to referendum; requiring the chief election official also to make a determination and certify the sufficiency of the petition within a specified time period; providing that a sponsor that seeks an advance determination of the sufficiency of a petition may not circulate the petition for signatures during a specified period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM