Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegate Myers
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing that specified former school vehicles be equipped with and use specified safety equipment; applying specified rules of the road related to the use of specified safety lighting for school vehicles to specified former school vehicles; requiring that specified safety lighting for specified former school vehicles be deactivated under specified circumstances; requiring that the words "school bus" on former school vehicles be covered or concealed; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-706, 22-218, 22-228, 22-418 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM