Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Gang-Free Zones - Penalties for Gang Activity
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell and Clippinger
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from threatening an individual, or a friend or family member of an individual, with or using physical violence to coerce, induce, or solicit the individual to participate in or prevent the individual from leaving a criminal gang in, on, or within a specified distance from a postsecondary school, specified property operated by a State or local transit authority, and a State or local recreation area or park; and increasing the penalty for specified gang activity.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM