Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction - Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Lee, Frush, Guzzone, Ivey, Jones, A. Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Simmons, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public school student to complete instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator to graduate from high school, beginning with students entering grade 9 in the 2013-2014 school year; requiring each county board of education to provide instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and automated external defibrillator use in specified schools beginning in the 2014-2015 school year, using a specified instructional program and incorporating specified skills; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0929
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM