Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting Orders
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a direct wine shipper's permit entitles the holder to sell specified wine by receiving and filling orders that the consumer transmits directly to the permit holder; and prohibiting an order to be transmitted to the permit holder by a retailer, a wholesaler, or any other third party, including a marketplace site on the Internet in which sellers offer products to customers.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0990
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM