Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Bobo, Braveboy, Carter, Conaway, George, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Howard, Kipke, Mitchell, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State to establish the Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program for victims of human trafficking; stating the purpose of the Program; establishing eligibility requirements of the Program; establishing application and participation requirements of the Program; requiring an applicant to provide a specified release and waiver of future claims against the State; prohibiting false statements in an application; establishing penalties for a violation of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-505 )
(   7-301 through 7-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM