Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jacobs, and Otto
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that specified local governing bodies use at least a specified amount of the local governing body's annual apportionment for acquisition projects under Program Open Space; authorizing a local governing body to use all of the local governing body's annual apportionment for acquisition projects; altering the required contents of a local land preservation and recreation plan; repealing a requirement that the Department of Planning prepare specified guidelines; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0896
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Natural Resources - Program Open Space - Use of Local Funds
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page