Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan Downs
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Racing Commission to issue a license to the Land Preservation Trust, Inc. to hold racing at one 1-day race meeting a year at Shawan Downs; authorizing the licensee to choose, subject to the Commission's approval, the racing date; requiring the licensee to reimburse the Commission for certain costs; requiring the licensee to allocate certain profits in a certain manner; requiring a certain licensee to make certain deductions from a certain handle; requiring that certain money, after deductions, be returned as winnings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan Downs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan Downs
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM