Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Conaway, Kelly, Krimm, J. Lewis, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person who is licensed to drive by another state to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program under certain circumstances; prohibiting a nonresident participant in the Program from driving or attempting to drive certain vehicles; modifying certain procedures used by police officers and the Motor Vehicle Administration concerning certain administrative offenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {552917/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {552917/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed Drivers
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-116, 11-140, 16-205.1, 16-404, 16-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM