Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Hayes, and Ali
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, before taking final action concerning the continued use of a public school facility for specified purposes, the Baltimore City Department of Planning shall appoint a community task force to review and make recommendations concerning the future use of the public school facility; specifying that the task force include specified members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task Force
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM