Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Carter, Glenn, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified criminal violations for the use, possession, and sale of marijuana; establishing specified exemptions from prosecution for specified persons for using, obtaining, purchasing, transporting, or possessing marijuana in specified circumstances; providing exemptions from prosecution for specified retailers, wholesalers, and safety compliance facilities in specified circumstances; establishing a specified affirmative defense; establishing a fine for a specified civil violation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1201 through 5-1230, 5-601, 5-620 )
(   12.5-101 through 12.5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM