Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Career and Technology Centers or STEM and STEAM Classrooms (Student Preparedness Act of 2016)
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Arentz, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Folden, Ghrist, S. Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Parrott, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the provisions of the prevailing wage law do not apply to a public work contract or part of a public work contract for the construction or renovation of a career and technology center or for school classroom space to be used for science, technology, engineering, mathematics (STEM) or science, technology, engineering, art, mathematics (STEAM) education; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0440
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM