Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring funds in the Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund first to be used for the sole purpose of completing the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park until the development of the park is complete; requiring the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners to adopt a certain plan after the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park is complete; altering the distribution of revenue from the State's admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0352 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {830416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding Extension
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {830416/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text - Chapter - Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM